HI SB1363 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1363
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes $ as the Office of Hawaiian Affairs' pro rata share of the public land trust. Transfers $ less certain funds to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs for underpayment of the public land trust funds for 7/1/2012 to 6/30/2019. Requires the Director of Finance to make up the difference between a specified minimum amount and an amount of public land trust receipts from an agency to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs by transferring the difference into the carry-forward trust holding account. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to provide an annual accounting of receipts from lands described in section 5(f) of the Admission Act. Establishes a committee to recommend the annual amount of the income and proceeds from the public land trust that the Office of Hawaiian Affairs shall receive annually. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Increasing The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs' Pro Rata Share Of Public Land Trust Funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 555) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-19 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1363 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
HB402 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 868).
HB402 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 868).