HI SB1371 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 870).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the abandonment of lay nets used for fishing. Authorizes DLNR to issue permits for the use and possession of lay nets. Requires DLNR to establish a comprehensive, statewide lay net education and enforcement program. (SB1371 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Lay Nets.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 870).
2019-04-25HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-19 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 312.
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 863).
2019-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-24HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Todd, Thielen.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 707).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2107), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-02HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-27HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Friday, 03-29-19 at 2:00 PM.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-25HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-13HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 463) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-26-19 11:31AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WTL, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback