HI SB1374 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1374
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 869).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 869).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Hawaii Retirement Savings Program for private sector employees. Establishes the Hawaii Retirement Savings Program Administrative Fund. Requires the Department of Budget and Finance to prepare an annual report detailing the Department's activities for the previous fiscal year to the Governor and Legislature. Appropriates funds. Exempts employers if they offered a qualified retirement plan to some or all of its employees within the last five years. (SB1374 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Retirement Savings Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 869). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-19 5:40PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-25 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 949). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 708). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2114), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1550) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 464) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1374 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 869).