HI SB1382 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1382
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires both chambers of the legislature to establish rules for livestreaming public hearings and informational briefings at the State Capitol to the public through audiovisual technology. Appropriates moneys. Requires the legislative broadcast program to make an audio or audiovisual recording of all public hearings and informational briefings held at the State Capitol and maintain an archive of the recordings to be made available to the public. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Legislative Broadcast Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 467) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 731) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:21PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1382 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Legislative Broadcast Program
Legislative Reference Bureau
Livestreaming
Public Access Room
Record
Legislative Broadcast Program
Legislative Reference Bureau
Livestreaming
Public Access Room
Record