HI SB1386 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to develop a state 2030 natural resources conservation goal action plan and allocates one per cent of the revenues of the transient accommodations tax for deposit into the special land and development fund to be used for the development, submission, and evaluation of progress of the action plan. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1386 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
State 2030 Natural Resources Conservation Goal Action Plan
Department of Land and Natural Resources
State 2030 Natural Resources Conservation Goal Action Plan