HI SB1394 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 267, 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 267, 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a historic preservation income tax credit. Repeals on 12/31/2024. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 267, 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 267, on 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 190) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 190). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Hashem, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:25PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 1:07PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 789). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Okimoto, San Buenaventura, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2171) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cullen, Hashem, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Hashimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Woodson. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 470) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1129) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 645) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |