HI SB1396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism the China-Hawaii Economic Council to further economic relations between China and Hawaii. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Economic Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee on LCA deferred the measure.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on LCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to LCA/EET, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB538 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4
HB1338 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback