HI SB1404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the Health Care Provider Loan Repayment Program administered through the John A. Burns School of Medicine of the University of Hawaii at Manoa; provided that the funds are matched on a dollar-for-dollar basis by a private or another public source. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Loan Repayment For Health Care Professionals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kim, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-17SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 810).
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kim, English Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Gates Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Tarnas, Okimoto.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 710).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2093), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1641) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:15PM in conference room 309.
2019-03-15HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 03-15-19 2:40PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-12HouseRe-referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 31
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 474) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 732) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to CPH/HRE, WAM.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB902 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback