HI SB1417 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the minimum number of members necessary to constitute a quorum to do business at ten. Establishes the number of votes necessary to validate any action of the Council as the concurrence of at least a majority of quorum. Repeal June 30, 2013. (SB1417 HD1)
Title
State Rehabilitation Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) One Day Notice 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno Chair; Jordan, C. Lee, Wooley, Pine. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 604). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Chang, Keith-Agaran, Saiki, Souki, Ward excused (6). | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1431) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The votes in HUS were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 03-17-11. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by HUS on Monday, 03-21-11 10:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Pine. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-17-11 at 10:30 am in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-17-11 at 10:30 am. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-14-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HUS, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 338) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1565 (Same As) 2011-03-08 - (S) Referred to HMS.