HI SB1420 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1420
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enables the Hawaii emergency management agency to coordinate with non-profit and business entities; enables the governor to authorize payment to state employees for performing disaster relief activities within their communities; and authorizes county emergency management agencies to encourage the formation and registration of multi-sector disaster relief community networks and incorporate registered networks into emergency management plans.
Title
Relating To Disaster Relief.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1420 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Community Networks
County Emergency Management Agency
Disaster Preparedness
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
County Emergency Management Agency
Disaster Preparedness
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1420&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1420_.HTM |