HI SB1430 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1430
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows naturopathic physicians and physician assistants to provide written certification for qualifying patients. Allows licensed dispensaries to have up to two additional manufacturing or processing facilities separate from their production facilities. Provides a process for the voluntary or involuntary sale or transfer of an individual dispensary license. Allows retail dispensaries to operate on state and federal holidays. Allows a licensed dispensary to purchase medical cannabis or manufactured cannabis products from another licensed dispensary, with department approval, in the event of a crop failure. Allows remediation of any cannabis batch that fails laboratory testing standards as long as any final product passes such standards. Allows licensed retail dispensaries to sell edible cannabis and cannabidiol products.
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1430 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
HB673 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 240, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
HB673 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 240, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1430&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1430_.HTM |