HI SB1433 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1433
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period in which a county may adopt an ordinance to establish a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from 3/31/2019 to 12/31/2019. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 528) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-19. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 2 offered. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-19. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1433 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28