HI SB1443 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a company from receiving a grant in consecutive years under the manufacturing development program.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:21PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM/JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1443 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1443&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1443_.HTM |