HI SB1445 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1445
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides public school teachers and educational officers who have completed a year's satisfactory service with an annual incremental increase in salary.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1445 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HB1275 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to LCA/EDU, WAM.
HB1275 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to LCA/EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1445&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1445_.HTM |