HI SB1446 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the administrator of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to receive approval from the board for appointments of the chief financial officer, director of human resources, and attorney. Provides the board the option of having a direct supervisory role over the chief financial officer, director of human resources, and attorney. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee on HWN deferred the measure.
2019-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HWN, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback