HI SB1447 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for operating expenses of charter schools and the state public charter school commission. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Charter Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback