HI SB1455 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1455
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows private cemeteries in good standing with the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to disinter and reinter human bodies within the same cemetery without filing an application for a permit with the Department of Health.
Title
Relating To Disinterment Of Human Bodies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1455 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH.
HB214 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 198, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).
HB214 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 198, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1455&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1455_.HTM |