HI SB1456 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1456
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds (SPRB) to assist E Ola Mau Na Leo O Kekaha with the acquisition, remediation, and development of the old Kekaha Sugar Mill in Kekaha, Kauai, Hawaii.
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist E Ola Mau Na Leo O Kekaha.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1456 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
HB1413 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 043, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
HB1413 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 043, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1456&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1456_.HTM |