HI SB1468 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to PSM/HOU/AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to PSM/HOU/AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a county to approve, approve with modification, or disapprove an application for a permit necessary for a housing development project that uses moneys from the rental housing revolving fund. Provides for automatic permit approval if a county does not make a timely decision on an application. Exempts the foregoing projects from environmental impact statement requirements. Sunsets on 6/30/2026.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1468 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PSM/HOU/AEN, WAM.
HB1403 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1403 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1468&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1468_.HTM |