HI SB1469 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to determine whether the implementation of a cost recovery and income generating mechanism of leasing unused fiber, conduit, and other infrastructure is in the public interest. Requires the public utilities commission to report on economic incentives, cost recovery mechanisms considered, and the financial impacts where implemented.
Title
Relating To Public Utility Infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1469 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HB1384 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1384 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1469&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1469_.HTM |