HI SB147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for administrative rules in the adoption process of the state building codes.
Title
Relating To The State Building Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB147 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB494 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB494 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Adoption Procedures
Amendments
Building Codes
Department of Accounting and General Services
State Fire Council Package
Amendments
Building Codes
Department of Accounting and General Services
State Fire Council Package
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=147&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB147_.HTM |