HI SB1483 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "lot", "houselot", "residential lot", and "residential houselot" in section 516-1, HRS, by deleting the requirement that such parcels be zoned for residential use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Residential Leaseholds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateThe committee on HOU deferred the measure.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-02-05SenateRe-Referred to HOU, WAM.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to HOU/CPH, WAM.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HOU, CPH.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1397 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback