HI SB1484 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 021, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 021, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from insurance code, associations (1) Organized before 1880; (2) Whose members are active, retired, or honorably discharged members of the U.S. armed forces or sea services; and (3) Whose principal purpose is to provide insurance and other benefits to their members. (SB1484 HD2)
Title
Insurance; Fraternal Benefit Societies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (S) Act 021, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Act 021, on 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 606). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Tsutsui. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) One Day Notice 04-15-11. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-15-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 405). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Saiki, Takumi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-08-11. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1427) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-30-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-17-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 350) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |