HI SB1484 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the department of land and natural resources to devise an appropriate plan to create a hiking trail from Malaekahana state park, along the coast, to Turtle Bay Resort passing makai of the James Campbell National Wildlife Refuge and continuing from Kawela Bay along the coast of Waialee to Sunset Beach. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hiking Trails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback