HI SB1497 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1497
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to provide education and support to local businesses regarding the Food and Drug Administration's industry guidance on colored sea salt.
Title
Relating To Food Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1497 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HB1229 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
HB1229 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1497&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1497_.HTM |