HI SB1498 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each state agency with rules affecting small businesses to submit an annual report to the Small Business Regulatory Review Board (Board) regarding the statutory changes that impact these rules, and the status of each amended or new rule for which adoption is pending. Requires the Governor to direct state agencies to work with the Board to develop internal processes to expedite rulemaking actions due to a change in applicable law. Effective July 1, 2112. (SB1498 HD1)
Title
Small Business Regulatory Review Board; Rules
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6). | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 986) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Pine. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 03-15-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to ERB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 357) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Solomon. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-11 9:45AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 328) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT, CPN/WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-11-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDT. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |