HI SB1502 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1502
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the chairperson of the Hawaiian Homes Commission or the chairperson's designee to serve as an ex officio, voting member of the Commission on Water Resource Management.
Title
Relating To The Chairperson Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-19 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1502 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1502&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1502_.HTM |