HI SB1523 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that workers registered with the department of health's medical cannabis program be reimbursed for the out of pocket cost of medical cannabis through the workers' compensation system in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Workers' Compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateThe committee on LCA deferred the measure.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on LCA/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to LCA/CPH, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1534 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback