HI SB1527 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the sale of beverage containers connected to each other with plastic connecting devices. Establishes fines. Establishes the plastic reduction special fund. Takes effect 1/1/2021. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 195) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1527 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC/WAM.