HI SB1530 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes the conversion of the means of financing for the Hawaii Community Development Authority staff from the Hawaii community development revolving fund to the general fund contingent upon the Hawaii Community Development Authority developing and submitting a plan to transfer its control of the Kakaako Community Development District to the City and County of Honolulu. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Moriwaki . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Luke, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 10:40AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-22HouseRe-referred to LAB, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 56
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 800).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2194) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nishimoto.
2019-04-02HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-04-01HouseRe-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 45
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1365) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 3).
2019-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-19.
2019-03-05SenateReport filed.
2019-03-05SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2019-03-05SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
2019-03-05SenateFloor Amendment No. 6 offered.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1189) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-26-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 660) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 02-11-19 3:00PM in conference room CR 414.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback