HI SB1534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits ticket sellers from disclosing ticket purchasing information to any third party unless the ticket seller has received consent from the ticket purchaser. Prohibits ticket sellers from disclosing ticket purchasers' personally identifiable information. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 9:35AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1534 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27