HI SB1539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies the right to a prompt bail hearing upon formal charge and detention. Establishes right to counsel at the bail hearing. (SB1539 HD1)
Title
Related To Bail Hearings.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee, Gates Co-Chairs. |
2019-04-22 | House | Re-referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 56 |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 801). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Say, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1682), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 519) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 803) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1539 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).