HI SB1541 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a minimum-security housing program in a county with a population of more than 750,000 for short-term adult offenders. Provides capacity for a furlough program. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1541 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
HB1551 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB1551 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1541&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1541_.HTM |