HI SB156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB156
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to GVO/EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to GVO/EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the government's use of facial recognition systems, except in certain circumstances. Does not apply to personal use of a privately owned facial recognition system when acting in an unofficial capacity.
Title
Relating To Violation Of Privacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/EET, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB156 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to GVO/EET, JDC.
HB1226 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1226 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=156&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB156_.HTM |