HI SB157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for the adoption of administrative rules relating to the adoption process of the state building code.
Title
Relating To The State Building Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB157 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB504 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 4
HB504 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=157&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB157_.HTM |