HI SB160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an exemption from tort liability for the State and counties arising from lifeguard services, except for gross negligence or wanton acts or omissions.
Title
Relating To Tort Liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB160 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
HB178 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB178 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=160&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB160_.HTM |