HI SB162 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the law with respect to comfort letters issued by the department of taxation.
Title
Taxation; Comfort Letters
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |