HI SB182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows counties to adopt and enforce additional ordinances that regulate the sale or use of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices. Requires county ordinances to be no less protective of public health than state law. Repeals statute that preempts local smoking ordinances and regulations and voids any local law or regulation that conflicts with state smoking laws.
Title
Relating To County Authority On The Sale Of Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB182 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
HB195 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB195 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Cigarettes
Counties
Electronic Smoking Devices
Home Rule
Maui County Package
Public Health
Smoking
Tobacco Use
Counties
Electronic Smoking Devices
Home Rule
Maui County Package
Public Health
Smoking
Tobacco Use
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=182&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB182_.HTM |