HI SB185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB185
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period in which a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from 3/31/2019 to 3/31/2020. Authorizes the use of surcharge revenues to address affordable housing and homelessness. Exempts gross income and gross proceeds for medical services or food from the surcharge.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
HB198 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
HB198 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=185&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB185_.HTM |