HI SB19 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 261, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1364).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 261, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1364).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts landlords and lessors who install renewable energy systems on their property and provide, sell, or transmit electricity generated from those renewable energy systems to tenants or lessees on the premises from the definition of public utility, under certain conditions. (CD1)
Title
Renewable Energy; Landlords; Lessors; Public Utility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 261, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1364). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 261, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1364). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 75). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-30-13 |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 75) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Kawakami, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 4:30PM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 11:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 698). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Lowen, Thielen. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 492). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1550) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1184) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-21 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-13 8:35AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-13. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 53) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 524) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB453 (Same As) 2013-02-27 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.