HI SB19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the calculation of surplus lines insurance premium tax to tax the entirety of the premium using the rate established by Hawaii statute regardless of location of risk. (SB19 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Surplus Lines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 916).
2019-04-18SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 722).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2147) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-19HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
2019-03-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 719) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB71 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback