HI SB192 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 247, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1350).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes solicitation of a minor for prostitution a crime. Increases the statute of limitations to bring a cause of action for coercion into prostitution from two to six years. Clarifies the minimum and maximum fine for a person convicted of committing the offense of prostitution. Adds the offenses of solicitation of a minor for prostitution, habitual solicitation of prostitution, and solicitation of prostitution near schools and public parks under the State's forfeiture laws. Amends the definition of "sexual offense" under the sexual offender registry laws to include acts that consist of the solicitation of a minor who is less than eighteen years of age for prostitution. Requires registration with the sexual offender registry for conviction of solicitation of a minor for prostitution as a tier 1 offense. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution; Minors; Offenses; Statute of Limitations; Forfeiture; Sex Offender Registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 247, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1350).
2013-07-09HouseAct 247, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1350).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 64) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 64).
2013-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
2013-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Brower, Kawakami, Thielen.
2013-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement and Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 596).
2013-04-09SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-05SenateDeferred until 04-09-13.
2013-04-04SenateDeferred until 04-05-13.
2013-04-03SenateDeferred until 04-04-13.
2013-04-02SenateDeferred until 04-03-13.
2013-04-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 397).
2013-04-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (3).
2013-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Wooley.
2013-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-13.
2013-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-13.
2013-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2013-02-28SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2013-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to JDL.
2013-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1066 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to JDL.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback