HI SB2 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 255, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the offenses of terroristic threatening in the first degree and robbery in the first degree to include the use of simulated firearms. (SB2 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Simulated Firearms; Terroristic Threatening; Robbery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 255, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
2013-07-09HouseAct 255, on 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
2013-05-08SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 752).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25SenateDeferred until 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-09-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2013-04-23SenateThe Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2013-04-22SenateThe Senate Conference Managers have scheduled a decision making to agree to the House amendments on 04-23-13 1:15PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Har Chair; Ito, Thielen.
2013-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement and Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 596).
2013-04-09SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard.
2013-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-05SenateDeferred until 04-09-13.
2013-04-04SenateDeferred until 04-05-13.
2013-04-03SenateDeferred until 04-04-13.
2013-04-02SenateDeferred until 04-03-13.
2013-04-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 394).
2013-04-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, Hanohano, McDermott voting no (4) and Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (3).
2013-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Wooley.
2013-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 43).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-13.
2013-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-13.
2013-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2013-02-28SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 488) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2013-01-17SenateReferred to JDL.
2013-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB498 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback