HI SB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a post-conviction relief task force to review and propose potential updates to Hawaii's laws and court rules regarding post-conviction relief. (SB2 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Criminal Defense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Wakai, Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 721).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2109) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-02HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-03-29HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-27HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-27HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-29-19 at 2:00PM.
2019-03-25HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 30).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 770) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB711 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Transmitted to Governor.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback