HI SB203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 218, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that pharmacists may perform certain vaccinations or immunizations and are required to maintain immunization records. (SB203 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Vaccinations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 218, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
2019-07-09HouseAct 218, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 914).
2019-04-18SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 813).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Belatti, Ward.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 574).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-19.
2019-04-02HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1937) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HousePass First Reading
2019-03-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 17).
2019-03-01SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Ruderman . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB686 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback