HI SB2051 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 169, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 169, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits individual department of education schools and career pathways, academies, or programs operated within a department of education school, to engage in commercial enterprises, including the sale of goods produced by or for an individual school, career pathway, academy, or program. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 169, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 169, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92-18). |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Gates, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Gates, Kong, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 555). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 405). |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1813-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1341-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-19 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Learmont, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Ing. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-19-18 3:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 76) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2931) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU/ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2048 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).