HI SB2057 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Gives a preference to students who live within the service area of a school or who enrolled in the school the previous school year who apply for participation in a career and technical education program offered by that school. Establishes enrollment in a career and technical education program as a new exception to the requirement to attend school within the service area in which a student resides. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 101) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2916) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-11-20 10:40AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2301) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |