HI SB208 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB208
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 202, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 202, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the National Conference of Insurance Legislators' Model Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act, which requires life insurers to conduct database searches using the federal Social Security Administration's death master file or similar database to determine whether an insured has died. Requires life insurers to use good faith efforts to locate any beneficiaries to a policy, contract, or retained asset account. Authorizes the insurance commissioner to use discretion to limit, exempt, or phase-in compliance with requirements under certain circumstances. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 202, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 202, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33-18). |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1904-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1328-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2598) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-18 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 469) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB208 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.