HI SB2085 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of education to provide public school and public charter school students with behavior analysis services. Requires the department to seek any necessary approvals from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to amend the state Medicaid plan to include applied behavior analysis services for eligible students who have been diagnosed with an autism spectrum disorder. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Behavior Analysis.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 114) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3326) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2542) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |