HI SB210 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies criteria that must be considered in deciding whether to transfer inmates between correctional facilities located in Hawaii and correctional facilities located outside of Hawaii. Takes effect July 1, 2020. (SB210 HD1)
Title
Public Safety; Corrections; Inmate Transfers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 3:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 1:00pm in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 9:30am in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 9:30 AM in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 9:30am in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-09 9:30am in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-09 10:00 AM in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-09 9:30am in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Hanohano, M. Lee Co-Chairs; Aquino, Pine. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Bunda, Kidani, Slom. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 437). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Morita, Takai excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1670) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Pine, Ward. | |
2009-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-09 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-19 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-19-09 10:00 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 122) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Hemmings). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Hee, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM added the measure to the public decsion-making scheduled on 03-03-09 9:30am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, Kidani, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-10-09 1:15 pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-09 1:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to PSM, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |